06/15/2011 | Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |||
06/13/2011 | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. | |||
06/13/2011 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 14 yeas and 22 nays. | |||
06/09/2011 | Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 1 for 06/13. | |||
06/09/2011 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |||
06/08/2011 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | |||
04/25/2011 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | |||
04/14/2011 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |