|
07/01/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 57, nays 28. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/14/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Reported favorably (10-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 17 yeas and 19 nays.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2011
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Retirement.
|
|
|