06/08/2011 | Involuntarily deferred in committee. | |||
05/19/2011 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | |||
05/18/2011 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |||
05/17/2011 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 21 yeas and 13 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |||
05/12/2011 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |||
05/11/2011 | Reported with amendments. | |||
04/25/2011 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Health and Welfare. | |||
04/14/2011 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Health and Welfare. |