|
07/01/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 1 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 65, nays 30. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/20/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/19/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Reported with amendments (10-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 25 yeas and 10 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Rules suspended. Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
The amended bill was read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Senate floor amendments were read and adopted.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Education.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Education.
|
|
|