06/07/2011 | Involuntarily deferred in committee. | |||
05/31/2011 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | |||
05/26/2011 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |||
05/25/2011 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 20 yeas and 12 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |||
05/24/2011 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |||
05/23/2011 | Reported with amendments. | |||
04/25/2011 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. | |||
04/14/2011 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |