|
06/29/2011
|
Effective date 7/1/11.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 322.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/20/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/19/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/16/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/15/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/14/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Reported favorably (9-0) (Local and Consent). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2011
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Retirement.
|
|
|