|
06/29/2011
|
Effective date 6/29/11.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 332.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/20/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/19/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Reported favorably (21-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 3 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Finance.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
|
|
|