Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/06.
05/04/2011
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
05/02/2011
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
04/27/2011
Received from the House without amendments.
04/26/2011
Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in.
04/26/2011
Received in the House from the Senate.
04/25/2011
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 26 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.