06/01/2011 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | |||
05/18/2011 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |||
05/18/2011 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |||
05/17/2011 | Received from the House without amendments. | |||
05/17/2011 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | |||
05/17/2011 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |||
05/16/2011 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 27 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | |||
05/12/2011 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |