06/01/2011 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | |||
05/25/2011 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |||
05/24/2011 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |||
05/23/2011 | Received from the House without amendments. | |||
05/23/2011 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | |||
05/19/2011 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |||
05/19/2011 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | |||
05/18/2011 | Reported favorably. | |||
05/16/2011 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |