06/23/2011 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on June 27. | |||
06/15/2011 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |||
06/15/2011 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |||
06/14/2011 | Received from the House without amendments. | |||
06/14/2011 | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 99 yeas, 0 nays. | |||
06/09/2011 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/14/2011. | |||
06/09/2011 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | |||
06/08/2011 | Reported favorably (12-0). | |||
05/31/2011 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |||
05/26/2011 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |||
05/25/2011 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | |||
05/25/2011 | Rules suspended | |||
05/24/2011 | Reported favorably. | |||
05/19/2011 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Judiciary B. |