06/23/2011 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on June 27. | |||
06/15/2011 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |||
06/15/2011 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |||
06/14/2011 | Received from the House without amendments. | |||
06/14/2011 | Read by title, concurred in. | |||
06/09/2011 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/14/2011. | |||
06/09/2011 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | |||
06/08/2011 | Reported favorably (10-0). | |||
05/05/2011 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | |||
05/04/2011 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |||
05/03/2011 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 27 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | |||
05/02/2011 | Reported favorably. | |||
04/25/2011 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Education. |