|
06/23/2011
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on June 27.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on June 27.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Read by title, concurred in.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/21/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/20/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/19/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Reported with amendments (10-0-1).
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|