06/13/2011 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 06/10. | |||
06/09/2011 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |||
06/09/2011 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |||
06/08/2011 | Received from the House without amendments. | |||
06/08/2011 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | |||
06/07/2011 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |||
06/07/2011 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | |||
06/07/2011 | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. | |||
06/06/2011 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |