06/23/2011 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on June 27. | |||
06/21/2011 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |||
06/20/2011 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |||
06/19/2011 | Received from the House without amendments. | |||
06/19/2011 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | |||
06/19/2011 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |||
06/16/2011 | Senate amendments were read and adopted. Read by title as amended and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered engrossed and sent to the House. | |||
06/16/2011 | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. | |||
06/16/2011 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. | |||
06/15/2011 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |