06/07/2011 | Returned to the Senate and approved. | |||
06/07/2011 | Approved on 6/7/2011. | |||
06/02/2011 | Study request list distributed to members on 6/2/2011. | |||
05/31/2011 | Received on 5/31/2011. | |||
05/31/2011 | Sent to the House. | |||
05/23/2011 | Study request list distributed to the members on 5/23/11. | |||
05/20/2011 | Request study by the committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | |||
05/20/2011 | Received by the Senate Office on 5/20/11. |