Louisiana 2011 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR16

Introduced
5/4/11  

Caption

Recognizes May 4, 2011, as "Louisiana Chemical Industry Day".

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

LA SR12

Recognizes Tuesday, March 19, 2024, as Louisiana Chemical Industry Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.

LA HB330

Creates the Industrial Hemp Promotion and Research Program (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

LA HB531

Provides for the Louisiana Department of Economic Development to establish and administer the Louisiana Industrial Product Certification Program (RE +$202,029 SG EX See Note)

LA SR67

Declares May 5, 2010, as "Louisiana Chemical Industry Day" in Louisiana.

LA HR86

Recognizes May 7, 2013, as Louisiana Chemical Industry Day

LA HR37

Designates March 19, 2024, as Louisiana Chemical Industry Day at the state capitol

LA HR117

Recognizes Tuesday, May 6, 2014, as Louisiana Chemical Industry Day

LA SR83

Designates May 9, 2017, as Louisiana Chemical Industry Day.