LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2011 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SR4
Action History
LA
Louisiana Senate Bill SR4
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2011 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR4
Action History
06/01/2011
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
05/26/2011
Read by title and adopted.
05/19/2011
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
05/18/2011
Reported with amendments.
04/25/2011
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.