|
06/01/2012
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/1/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/19/2012.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Reported favorably (16-0) (Local and Consent).
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Read by title.
|
|
|