|
05/11/2012
|
Effective date: August 1, 2012.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 112.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/4/2012.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 798 reported by the Committee on Commerce (16-0).
|
|
|