|
05/22/2012
|
Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 13 yeas and 25 nays. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/8/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Reported with amendments (9-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
04/03/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2012
|
Read by title.
|
|
|