|
06/05/2012
|
Effective date: July 1, 2012.
|
|
|
|
06/05/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 510.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 5/29/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/2/2012.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Reported favorably (11-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
04/03/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2012
|
Read by title.
|
|
|