|
05/28/2012
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2012
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 84, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/19/2012.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Reported favorably (17-0) (Local and Consent).
|
|
|
|
04/03/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2012
|
Read by title.
|
|
|