LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2012 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB1069
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HB1069
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2012 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HB1069
Action History
05/21/2012
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
05/21/2012
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
05/15/2012
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/21/2012.
05/15/2012
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
05/14/2012
Reported with amendments (13-0) (Regular).
04/03/2012
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
04/02/2012
Read by title.