|
06/13/2012
|
Effective date: June 13, 2012.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 819.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2012
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 3 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/7/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Reported with amendments (10-0-1) (Regular). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2012
|
Read by title.
|
|
|