|
06/14/2012
|
Effective date: August 1, 2012.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 821.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/1/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2012
|
Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2012
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 14 yeas and 17 nays.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2012
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2012.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Reported favorably (12-0-1) (Local and Consent).
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2012
|
Read by title.
|
|
|