|
06/05/2012
|
Effective date: August 1, 2012.
|
|
|
|
06/05/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 520.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2012
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/26/2012.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Reported favorably (13-0) (Local and Consent).
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2012
|
Read by title.
|
|
|