05/08/2012 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | |||
05/07/2012 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |||
05/03/2012 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |||
04/26/2012 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/3/2012. | |||
04/25/2012 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |||
04/24/2012 | Reported with amendments (10-0) (Regular). | |||
04/04/2012 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | |||
04/03/2012 | Read by title. |