|
06/14/2012
|
Effective date: August 1, 2012.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 828.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/1/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/17/2012.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 892 reported by the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works (16-0).
|
|
|