|
05/25/2012
|
Effective date: May 25, 2012.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 293.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 5/15/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/17/2012.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 683 reported by the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment (12-0-1).
|
|
|