|
05/25/2012
|
Effective date: August 1, 2012.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 296.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/24/2012.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 893 reported by the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs (7-0).
|
|
|