|
05/14/2012
|
Effective date: August 1, 2012.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 115.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 3/28/2012.
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Reported with amendments (14-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
|
01/30/2012
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/30/2012.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2012
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2012
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|