|
05/16/2012
|
Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/15/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/7/2012.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 682 reported by the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works (11-4).
|
|
|