|
06/15/2012
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 865.
|
|
|
|
06/05/2012
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Conference committee report received.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Rules suspended. Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 85, nays 17. Having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Adley, Heitmeier, and Murray.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
House conferees appointed: St. Germain, Adams, and Connick.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 58, nays 27. The Senate amendments, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were rejected. Conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/1/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 4. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/17/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/15/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 935 reported by the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works (12-1).
|
|
|