Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
05/17/2012
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
05/16/2012
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 73, nays 16. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
05/11/2012
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/16/2012.
05/11/2012
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
05/10/2012
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 407 reported by the Committee on Education (14-0).