05/29/2012 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. | |||
05/23/2012 | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. | |||
05/23/2012 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 53, nays 40. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |||
05/23/2012 | Called from the calendar. | |||
05/21/2012 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/23/2012. | |||
05/21/2012 | Notice given. | |||
05/21/2012 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |||
05/15/2012 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/21/2012. | |||
05/15/2012 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |||
05/14/2012 | Rules suspended. Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 717 reported by the Committee on Appropriations (9-5-1). |