|
06/05/2012
|
Effective date: August 1, 2012.
|
|
|
|
06/05/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 484.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/24/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 3/26/2012.
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Reported favorably (12-0) (Local and Consent).
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/17/2012.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2012
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2012
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|