|
06/15/2012
|
Effective date: June 15, 2012.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 863.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 84, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/21/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Reported favorably (14-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/24/2012.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|