HLS 12RS-110 ORIGINAL Page 1 of 3 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. Regular Session, 2012 HOUSE BILL NO. 21 BY REPRESENTATIVE TALBOT RETIREMENT/PUBLIC OFFLS: (Constitutional Amendment) Provides relative to service credit in public retirement systems received by part-time public officials A JOINT RESOLUTION1 Proposing to amend Article X, Section 29.1(B) of the Constitution of Louisiana, to prohibit2 certain part-time public officials in public retirement systems from receiving service3 credit in such plans; to provide for submission of the proposed amendment to the4 electors; and to provide for related matters.5 Section 1. Be it resolved by the Legislature of Louisiana, two-thirds of the members6 elected to each house concurring, that there shall be submitted to the electors of the state of7 Louisiana, for their approval or rejection in the manner provided by law, a proposal to8 amend Article X, Section 29.1(B) of the Constitution of Louisiana, to read as follows:9 §29.1. Part-time Public Officials10 Section 29.1.11 * * *12 (B)(1) The provisions of Paragraph (A) shall not apply to any person who13 is serving on January 1, 1997, in any elected or appointed position set forth in14 Paragraph (A) and who is also a member on January 1, 1997, of a retirement system15 covering that position.16 (2) Notwithstanding any provision to the contrary, including prohibition on17 the reduction of compensation or salary during a term of office, no person authorized18 by Subparagraph (1) of this Paragraph to receive service credit in a public retirement19 system, fund, or plan sponsored by the state of Louisiana or any instrumentality or20 HLS 12RS-110 ORIGINAL HB NO. 21 Page 2 of 3 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. political subdivision thereof shall receive service credit in any such system, fund, or1 plan for service after December 31, 2012.2 * * *3 Section 2. Be it further resolved that this proposed amendment shall be submitted4 to the electors of the state of Louisiana at the statewide election to be held on November 6,5 2012.6 Section 3. Be it further resolved that on the official ballot to be used at the election,7 there shall be printed a proposition, upon which the electors of the state shall be permitted8 to vote FOR or AGAINST, to amend the Constitution of Louisiana, which proposition shall9 read as follows:10 Do you support an amendment to prohibit certain part-time public officials11 who are members of public retirement systems from continuing to accrue12 service credit after December 31, 2012? (Amends Article X, Section 29.1(B))13 DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] Talbot HB No. 21 Abstract: Prohibits part-time public officials who were grandfathered into membership in public retirement systems from continuing to receive service credit after Dec. 31, 2012. Present constitution provides that the following elected or appointed officials are deemed to be "part-time" public servants and prohibits them from participation in or receiving credit for service in any public retirement system for such public service: (1)Legislators and members of school boards, levee boards, police juries, and parish councils. (2)Members of city councils, city-parish councils, town councils, aldermen, and constables. (3)Any member of a board or commission established by the state of La. or any instrumentality or political subdivision thereof, unless authorized by a law enacted by 2/3 of the members of each house. (4)Any person holding or serving in any other elected or appointed position or office defined to be "part-time" public service by law enacted by 2/3 of the members of each house. HLS 12RS-110 ORIGINAL HB NO. 21 Page 3 of 3 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. Present constitution exempts from this prohibition any person who was serving in one of the enumerated part-time positions on Jan. 1, 1997, and who was a member of a retirement system covering that position. Proposed constitution prohibits such "part-time" officials from receiving credit in a public retirement system for service after Dec. 31, 2012. Provides for submission of the proposed amendment to the voters at the statewide election to be held Nov. 6, 2012. (Amends Const. Art. X, §29.1(B))