05/08/2012 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |||
05/03/2012 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/8/2012. | |||
05/03/2012 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |||
05/02/2012 | Reported with amendments (7-2) (Regular). | |||
03/20/2012 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |||
03/19/2012 | Read by title. | |||
02/24/2012 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/24/2012. | |||
02/24/2012 | Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date. |