|
05/11/2012
|
Effective date: May 11, 2012.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 70.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/11/2012.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2012
|
Reported favorably (16-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/24/2012.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|