|
05/09/2012
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/9/2012.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 49, nays 46. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/24/2012.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Reported with amendments (8-6) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/24/2012.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|