04/09/2012 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |||
04/03/2012 | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/9/2012. | |||
04/03/2012 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |||
04/02/2012 | Reported favorably (11-0) (Regular). | |||
03/12/2012 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. | |||
01/30/2012 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/30/2012. | |||
01/27/2012 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. | |||
01/27/2012 | Prefiled. |