|
06/11/2012
|
Effective date: June 11, 2012.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 704.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 20 yeas and 15 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 67, nays 30. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Conference committee report received.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/4/2012.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Appel, Donahue, and Allain.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
House conferees appointed: Harrison, Carter, and Girod Jackson.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 89, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 5/31/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 6 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 61, nays 39. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/9/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/7/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Reported favorably (9-3) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2012
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|