LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2012 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB3
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HB3
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2012 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HB3
Action History
05/17/2012
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
05/16/2012
Made Special Order of the Day No. 2 for 5/17/2012.
05/16/2012
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
05/15/2012
Reported favorably (18-0) (Regular).
03/21/2012
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
03/20/2012
Read by title.