Louisiana 2012 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB30 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version

                            HLS 12RS-386	ORIGINAL
Page 1 of 2
CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.
Regular Session, 2012
HOUSE BILL NO. 30
BY REPRESENTATIVE ARNOLD
RETIREMENT/LOCAL:  Relative to New Orleans Firefighters, provides for an increased
accrual rate for the calculation of retirement benefits
AN ACT1
To amend and reenact R.S. 11:3384(B), relative to the Firefighters' Pension and Relief Fund2
in the city of New Orleans; to increase the accrual rate for the calculation of3
retirement benefits; to provide an effective date; and to provide for related matters.4
Notice of intention to introduce this Act has been published5
as provided by Article III, Section 13 and Article X, Section6
29(C) of the Constitution of Louisiana.7
Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:8
Section 1.  R.S. 11:3384(B) is hereby amended and reenacted to read as follows: 9
ยง3384.  Firefighters employed after December 31, 1967; computation of benefits10
*          *          *11
B. If the firefighter has worked one or more hours of creditable service after12
December 31, 1995, he shall receive a retirement benefit equal to two and one-half13
three and one-third percent of his average compensation based on the four highest14
consecutive years of employment, multiplied by the number of years of creditable15
service. If the member continues to remain a member of the system beyond twelve16
years of service and such member attains the age of fifty, the retirement benefit for17
each year or portion of a year beyond twelve years of service and after age fifty, shall18
be an amount equal to three and one-third percent of the average annual19
compensation for each year or portion of a year. If the member continues service20 HLS 12RS-386	ORIGINAL
HB NO. 30
Page 2 of 2
CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.
beyond thirty years, the retirement benefit for each year or portion of a year beyond1
twelve years of service shall be an amount equal to three and one-third percent of the2
average annual compensation for each year or portion of a year.  However, the3
retirement benefit shall not exceed a total of three and one-third percent each year.4
The service benefits retirement benefit of such firefighter shall not exceed one5
hundred percent of the average compensation earned during any three the four6
highest average consecutive years of service employment preceding retirement.7
*          *          *8
Section 2. This Act shall become effective on July 1, 2012; if vetoed by the governor9
and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on July 1,10
2012, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later.11
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
Arnold	HB No. 30
Abstract: Increases the accrual rate from 2.5% to 3-1/3% for every year of creditable
service for members of the Firefighters' Pension and Relief Fund in the city of New
Orleans (NOFF), regardless of age.
Present law provides for benefit calculation for members of NOFF hired after Dec. 31, 1967,
who have worked one or more hours of service after Dec. 31, 1995.  Provides that such
members with less than 12 years of service accrue a retirement benefit at the rate of 2.5%
of average compensation for every year of service.  If membership in NOFF continues
beyond 12 years of service and the member reaches age 50, his retirement benefit accrues
at the rate of 3-1/3% for each year of service beyond 12 years and after age 50. Members
with more than 30 years of service accrue a retirement benefit of 3-1/3% per year for every
year of service beyond 12 years, regardless of the age at which the benefit was accrued.
Proposed law increases the accrual rate from 2.5% to 3-1/3% for every year of creditable
service, regardless of the age or duration of service of the member.
Effective July 1, 2012.
(Amends R.S. 11:3384(B))