04/24/2012 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |||
04/18/2012 | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/24/2012. | |||
04/17/2012 | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |||
04/16/2012 | Reported with amendments (12-0) (Regular). | |||
04/05/2012 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | |||
04/04/2012 | Reported favorably (7-4) (Regular) To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | |||
03/12/2012 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |||
03/03/2012 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012. | |||
02/27/2012 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |||
02/27/2012 | Prefiled. |