LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2012 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB306
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HB306
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2012 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HB306
Action History
04/03/2012
Involuntarily deferred in committee.
03/12/2012
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
03/03/2012
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012.
02/27/2012
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
02/27/2012
Prefiled.