|
05/22/2012
|
Effective date: August 1, 2012.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 189.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/17/2012.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
Reported favorably (16-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2012
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|