|
05/14/2012
|
Effective date: August 1, 2012.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 121.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 05/10.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 90, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 5/9/2012.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 3/26/2012.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2012
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
Reported favorably (14-0) (Local and Consent).
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2012
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|